WI AB44 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 111.70 (4) (m) 5. and 119.16 (15) of the statutes; relating to: prohibiting the Milwaukee Public Schools from imposing residency requirements on teachers. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the Milwaukee Public Schools from imposing residency requirements on teachers. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-23HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2011-04-07HousePublic hearing held
2011-03-17HouseFiscal estimate received
2011-03-08HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Education
2011-03-08HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback