WI AB44 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-8-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 146.89 (1) (r); and to amend 146.89 (4) and 895.46 (1) (a) of the statutes; relating to: the Volunteer Health Care Provider Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Volunteer Health Care Provider Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-28 Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2009-10-23 Referred to committee on Rules
2009-10-23 Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Public Health, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2009-10-23 Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Public Health, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2009-08-18 LRB correction (Assembly amendment 1)
2009-05-05 Representative Hilgenberg added as a coauthor
2009-05-05 Executive action taken
2009-04-28 LRB correction
2009-03-16 Fiscal estimate received
2009-03-13 Fiscal estimate received
2009-03-10 Public hearing held
2009-03-09 Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Kaufert
2009-02-17 Read first time and referred to committee on Public Health
2009-02-17 Introduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback