WI AB437 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 49.45 (12) (a), 601.41 (8), 601.41 (10), 601.415 (12), 601.56, 601.57, 628.92 (5) and 635.10; to renumber and amend 601.64 (3) (c); to amend 15.165 (3) (b) 9., 49.45 (12) (b), 601.415 (3), 601.63 (2), 628.10 (2) (b), 646.11 (2), 646.51 (1m), 646.51 (3) (am), 646.51 (3) (ar) and 646.51 (3) (b); and to create 601.41 (13), 601.465 (1m) (c) 9m., 601.64 (3) (c) 2. a., b. and c., 609.98 (5), 611.12 (5) and 646.13 (2) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: various changes to insurance laws and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Various changes to insurance laws and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Published 3-23-2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 212 |
2024-03-18 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 |
2024-01-17 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-17-2024 |
2024-01-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Insurance and Small Business and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance and Small Business |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-14 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2023-11-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-11-14 | House | Read a second time |
2023-11-13 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-11-09 | House | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-11-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-11-08 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2023-11-08 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2023-11-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-10-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-10-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-10-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Callahan |
2023-09-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2023-09-20 | House | Introduced |