WI AB435 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 115.28 (55p), 118.40 (2r) (b) 2. m., 118.40 (2x) (b) 2. m., 118.60 (2) (a) 10., 119.23 (2) (a) 10. and 121.02 (1) (k) 4. of the statutes; Relating to: incorporating cursive writing into the state model English language arts standards and requiring cursive writing in elementary grades. (FE)
Title
Incorporating cursive writing into the state model English language arts standards and requiring cursive writing in elementary grades. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-28 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-25-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-09-28 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-09-28 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 59, Noes 39 |
2021-09-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-09-28 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-28 | House | Read a second time |
2021-09-23 | House | Placed on calendar 9-28-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-09-23 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-09-23 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 6, Noes 4 |
2021-09-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-09-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-08-04 | House | Representative Penterman added as a coauthor |
2021-07-21 | House | Representative L. Myers added as a coauthor |
2021-07-09 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2021-07-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2021-07-01 | House | Introduced |