WI AB435 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 23.33 (5) (a); to amend 23.33 (4) (b), 23.33 (5) (b) 1., 23.33 (5) (b) 2., 23.33 (5) (c), 23.33 (5) (d), 23.33 (11) (b), 23.33 (11m) (e) 2., 23.50 (1), 23.50 (3), 23.53 (1), 23.56 (1), 23.57 (1) (intro.), 23.58, 23.62 (1) (intro.) and 800.02 (2) (b); and to create 23.33 (1) (im), 23.33 (4) (f), 23.33 (5) (a) 2. and 23.33 (11r) of the statutes; relating to: the operation of all-terrain vehicles on highways for the purpose of certain types of access and granting rule-making authority.
Title
The operation of all-terrain vehicles on highways for the purpose of certain types of access and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Scott Gunderson [R] | Sen. David Hansen [D] |
Sen. Jim Holperin [D] | Rep. Dean Kaufert [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] |
Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Rep. Lee Nerison [R] | Rep. John Nygren [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Sen. Dale Schultz [R] | Rep. Scott Suder [R] | Rep. John Townsend [R] |
Rep. Mary Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-12-10 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-11-05 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-09-23 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation | |
2009-09-23 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab435 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB435.pdf |