WI AB433 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 343.301 (1g) (b) 1. and 343.301 (1g) (b) 2.; and to renumber and amend 343.301 (1g) (b) (intro.) of the statutes; relating to: requiring an ignition interlock device for first drunken driving offenses. (FE)
Title
Requiring an ignition interlock device for first drunken driving offenses. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Homeland Security and State Affairs and take up (Y: 38 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-13 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Homeland Security and State Affairs and take up, Ayes 38, Noes 59 |
2012-01-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-01-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-12-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-12-16 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Homeland Security and State Affairs |
2011-12-16 | House | Introduced |