WI AB431 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Fiscal estimate received
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 175.35 (1) (b); to renumber 175.35 (2) (a), (b), (c) and (d) and 175.35 (2j); to renumber and amend 175.35 (2) (intro.) and 175.35 (2i); to amend 20.455 (2) (gr), 175.35 (title), 175.35 (1) (at), 175.35 (2g) (a), 175.35 (2g) (b) 1., 175.35 (2g) (b) 2., 175.35 (2k) (ar) 2., 175.35 (2k) (c) 2. a., 175.35 (2k) (c) 2. b., 175.35 (2k) (g), 175.35 (2k) (h), 175.35 (2L), 175.35 (2t) (a), (b) and (c), 175.35 (3) (b) 2., 175.60 (7) (d), 175.60 (15) (b) 4. b., 938.208 (1) (b), 938.34 (4m) (b) 2., 938.341, 941.237 (1) (d), 941.296 (1) (b), 968.20 (3) (b), 971.17 (1g) and 973.176 (1); and to create 175.33, 175.35 (1) (br), 175.35 (2) (bm), 175.35 (2) (cm) (intro.), 175.35 (2i) (b) 2., 175.35 (2j) (b) and 941.29 (1m) (dm), (dn) and (do) of the statutes; Relating to: sales and transfers of firearms and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and transfers of firearms and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-08HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-10-29HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-10-17HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-09-12HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
2019-09-12HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback