WI AB431 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.685 (1) (c) 2., 50.065 (1) (e) 2., 103.34 (1) (b) 2. and 939.25 (1); and to repeal and recreate 948.21 of the statutes; Relating to: neglect of a child and providing criminal penalties. (FE)
Title
Neglect of a child and providing criminal penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-04 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2016-02-04 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2016-02-04 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2016-01-28 | House | Executive session held |
2016-01-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Tranel |
2015-12-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Tranel |
2015-11-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-11-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kessler |
2015-11-03 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2015-11-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tranel |
2015-10-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2015-10-21 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab431 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB431.pdf |