WI AB430 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.07 (5n) (a) 6. and 71.28 (5n) (a) 6.; and to create 71.07 (5n) (a) 6. a. and b. and 71.28 (5n) (a) 6. a. and b. of the statutes; Relating to: including crop insurance proceeds in the manufacturing and agricultural tax credit. (FE)
Title
Including crop insurance proceeds in the manufacturing and agricultural tax credit. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-10 | House | Representative Ballweg added as a coauthor |
2019-09-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-09-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab430 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB430.pdf |