WI AB43 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 23.33 (5) (a) and 23.33 (5) (c); to amend 23.33 (3) (g) and 23.33 (5) (am) 2.; and to create 23.33 (3) (gm), 23.33 (5) (a) 4., 23.33 (5) (c) 1., 23.33 (5) (c) 2. b., 23.33 (5) (c) 3. and 23.33 (5) (c) 4. of the statutes; Relating to: age and speed restrictions on, and safety certification requirements for, the operation of all-terrain vehicles and utility terrain vehicles.
Title
Age and speed restrictions on, and safety certification requirements for, the operation of all-terrain vehicles and utility terrain vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-04-23 | House | LRB correction |
2013-04-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-04-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Severson and Kapenga |
2013-02-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-02-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab43 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB43.pdf |