WI AB43 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on July 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-15 - Published 7-24-2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on July 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-15 - Published 7-24-2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 30.26 (2); to repeal and recreate 30.26 (4) (title); and to create 30.26 (2) (a) 3. and 30.26 (5) of the statutes; relating to: designating portions of the Totogatic River as a wild river.
Title
Designating portions of the Totogatic River as a wild river.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-15 | Published 7-24-2009. | |
2009-07-10 | Report approved by the Governor on 7-10-2009. 2009 Wisconsin Act 32 | |
2009-07-10 | Presented to the Governor on 7-9-2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2009-04-23 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2009-04-23 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-04-23 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2009-04-23 | Rules suspended | |
2009-04-23 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-04-23 | Read a second time | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on calendar 4-23-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-04-16 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-04-16 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 6, Noes 0 | |
2009-04-16 | Executive action taken | |
2009-03-26 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-03-26 | Received from Assembly | |
2009-03-26 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-03-26 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 88, Noes 9 | |
2009-03-26 | Rules suspended | |
2009-03-26 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-03-26 | Read a second time | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on calendar 3-26-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-03-19 | Report passage recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 14, Noes 0 | |
2009-03-18 | Executive action taken | |
2009-03-11 | Public hearing held | |
2009-02-19 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced |