WI AB428 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-10)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-10)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.355 (2d) (b) 3., 48.415 (9m) (b) 2. a., 48.417 (1) (d), 48.685 (1) (c) 2., 50.065 (1) (e) 1., 50.065 (1) (e) 2., 103.34 (1) (b) 2., 165.84 (7) (ab) 1., 165.84 (7) (ab) 2., 302.11 (1g) (a) 2., 938.355 (2d) (b) 3., 939.62 (2m) (a) 2m. b., 939.632 (1) (e) 1., 939.635, 939.74 (2) (c), 939.74 (2) (cm), 973.0135 (1) (b) 2., 973.015 (1m) (a) 3. a. and 973.017 (6) (b); and to create 343.12 (7) (c) 14m. and 948.03 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: repeated acts of physical abuse of the same child and providing a criminal penalty.
Title
Repeated acts of physical abuse of the same child and providing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-01-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2016-01-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-11-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-10-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2015-10-21 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab428 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB428.pdf |