WI AB426 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 16.42 (1) (f), 16.423 and 16.46 (5g) of the statutes; Relating to: submission of base budget review reports by state agencies, the legislature, and the courts. (FE)
Title
Submission of base budget review reports by state agencies, the legislature, and the courts. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-17 | House | Representative Brostoff withdrawn as a coauthor |
2017-10-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hutton |
2017-08-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-08-30 | House | Representative Kulp added as a coauthor |
2017-07-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2017-06-30 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab426 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB426.pdf |