WI AB420 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-14 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 66.1109 (3) (c); to amend 66.1109 (4); and to create 66.1109 (3) (c) 1., 66.1109 (3) (c) 2., 66.1109 (3) (cg) and 66.1109 (3) (cr) of the statutes; Relating to: public annual reports of business improvement districts. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public annual reports of business improvement districts. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-14SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-11-14SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2017-11-09SenateReceived from Assembly
2017-11-09HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-11-09HouseRepresentatives Macco and Barca added as coauthors
2017-11-09HouseRead a third time and passed
2017-11-09HouseRules suspended
2017-11-09HouseOrdered to a third reading
2017-11-09HouseRead a second time
2017-11-07HousePlaced on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules
2017-11-06HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2017-11-06HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2017-11-01HouseExecutive action taken
2017-10-10HouseRepresentative Ohnstad added as a coauthor
2017-10-05HousePublic hearing held
2017-09-29HouseRepresentative Brostoff added as a coauthor
2017-07-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-06-30HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-06-30HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback