WI AB420 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Published 3-28-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Published 3-28-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 8.10 (4) (b), 8.15 (2), 8.20 (5) and 8.40 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: providing a printed name for signers of nomination papers and petitions.
Title
Providing a printed name for signers of nomination papers and petitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 53 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 53 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 53 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Published 3-28-2014 |
2014-03-27 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 160 |
2014-03-26 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Elections and Urban Affairs |
2013-11-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-14 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 53, Noes 38, Paired 2 |
2013-11-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 53, Noes 39 |
2013-11-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-11-14 | House | Read a second time |
2013-11-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Pasch |
2013-11-12 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:09 PM on 11-14-2013 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2013-11-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-11-04 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2013-11-04 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2013-10-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-10-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative J. Ott |
2013-10-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-10-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2013-10-14 | House | Introduced |