WI AB42 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 450.03 (1) (j) of the statutes; Relating to: dispensing, distributing, or selling dialysate, drugs, or devices necessary for providing home peritoneal kidney dialysis.
Title
Dispensing, distributing, or selling dialysate, drugs, or devices necessary for providing home peritoneal kidney dialysis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-06 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-06-06 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-05-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-04-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rohrkaste |
2019-02-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab42 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB42.pdf |