WI AB419 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 165.83 (2) (d), 175.37 (title) and 175.37 (2); and to create 165.83 (2) (dd), 175.36 and 175.37 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: a requirement to report lost or stolen firearms and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
A requirement to report lost or stolen firearms and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-09-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab419 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB419.pdf |