WI AB419 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Published 4-3-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Published 4-3-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 7.50 (2) (e); and to create 7.50 (2) (em) of the statutes; Relating to: counting votes for write-in candidates.
Title
Counting votes for write-in candidates.
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Donald Pridemore [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Rep. Chad Weininger [R] | Rep. Lee Nerison [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Published 4-3-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-2-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 178 |
2014-03-26 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Elections and Urban Affairs |
2013-11-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-14 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2013-11-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-14 | House | Read a second time |
2013-11-12 | House | Placed on calendar 11-14-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-11-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-11-04 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2013-10-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-10-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-10-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2013-10-14 | House | Introduced |