WI AB418 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to affect 2015 Wisconsin Act 55, section 9422 (1); Relating to: extending the date for the repeal of two appropriations to the Office of the Commissioner of Insurance and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Extending the date for the repeal of two appropriations to the Office of the Commissioner of Insurance and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-06 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-11 | House | Published 11-12-2015 |
2015-11-11 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-11-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 85 |
2015-11-10 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-10-2015 |
2015-11-10 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-10-2015 |
2015-11-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-11-03 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-03 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 97, Noes 0 |
2015-11-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-11-03 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-03 | House | Read a second time |
2015-11-03 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2015-10-28 | House | Placed on calendar 11-3-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-10-23 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-23 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2015-10-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-10-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-10-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2015-10-16 | House | Introduced |