WI AB418 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 177.24 (1) (b); and to create 177.24 (1) (b) 2. and 177.35 (3) of the statutes; relating to: agreements to locate unclaimed property reported to the state treasurer.
Title
Agreements to locate unclaimed property reported to the state treasurer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | House | Published 4-19-2012 |
2012-04-06 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-6-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 231 |
2012-04-05 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-12 | House | Report correctly enrolled |
2012-03-07 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-7-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2012-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-16 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2012-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2012-02-14 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-02-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2012-02-13 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Homeland Security and State Affairs, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2012-02-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2012-01-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-12-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Homeland Security and State Affairs |
2011-12-07 | House | Introduced |