WI AB417 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 49.141 (1) (j) 2., 102.51 (1) (a) 2., 115.76 (12) (a) 2. and 115.76 (12) (a) 3.; to renumber and amend 891.40 (1) and 891.41 (1) (b); to amend 29.219 (4), 29.228 (5), 29.228 (6), 29.229 (2) (i), 29.2295 (2) (i), 29.563 (3) (a) 3., 29.607 (3), 45.01 (6) (c), 45.51 (3) (c) 2., 45.51 (5) (a) 1. b., 45.51 (5) (a) 1. c., 45.55, 46.10 (2), 48.02 (13), 48.396 (2) (dm), 48.422 (7) (bm), 48.422 (7) (br), 48.432 (1) (am) 2. b., 48.63 (3) (b) 4., 48.63 (3) (b) 5., 48.82 (1) (a), 48.837 (1r) (d), 48.837 (1r) (e), 48.837 (6) (b), 48.837 (6) (br), 48.913 (1) (a), 48.913 (1) (b), 48.913 (1) (h), 48.913 (2) (intro.), 48.913 (2) (b), 48.913 (2) (c) (intro.), 48.913 (3), 48.913 (4), 48.913 (7), 49.141 (1) (j) 1., 49.155 (1m) (c) 1g., 49.155 (1m) (c) 1h., 49.163 (2) (am) 2., 49.19 (1) (a) 2. a., 49.19 (4) (d) (intro.), 49.19 (4) (d) 1., 49.19 (4) (d) 2., 49.19 (4) (d) 3., 49.19 (4) (d) 4., 49.19 (4) (d) 5., 49.345 (2), 49.43 (12), 49.471 (1) (b) 2., 49.90 (4), 54.01 (36) (a), 54.960 (1), 69.03 (15), 69.05 (3m) (intro.), (a) and (b), 69.11 (4) (b), 69.12 (5), 69.13 (2) (b) 4., 69.14 (1) (c) 4., 69.14 (1) (e) (title) and 1., 69.14 (1) (f) 1., 69.14 (1) (g), 69.14 (2) (b) 2. d., 69.15 (1), 69.15 (3) (b) 3., 71.03 (2) (d) (title), 71.03 (2) (d) 1., 71.03 (2) (d) 2., 71.03 (2) (d) 3., 71.03 (2) (g), 71.03 (2) (m) 2., 71.03 (4) (a), 71.05 (22) (a) (title), 71.07 (5m) (a) 3., 71.07 (9e) (b), 71.09 (13) (a) 2., 71.52 (4), 71.83 (1) (a) 8., 71.83 (1) (b) 5., 77.25 (8m), 77.54 (7) (b) 1., 101.91 (5m), 102.07 (5) (b), 102.07 (5) (c), 102.51 (1) (a) 1., 103.10 (1) (h), 103.165 (3) (a) 3., 111.32 (12), 115.76 (12) (a) 1., 115.76 (13), 146.34 (1) (f), 157.05, 182.004 (6), 250.04 (3) (a), 301.12 (2), 301.50 (1), 700.19 (2), 705.01 (4), 705.01 (4m), 706.09 (1) (e), 765.001 (2), 765.01, 765.03 (1), 765.16 (1m) (intro.), 765.16 (1m) (c), 765.23, 765.24, 765.30 (3) (a), 766.587 (7) (form) 9., 766.588 (9) (form) 13., 766.589 (10) (form) 14., 767.215 (2) (b), 767.215 (5) (a) 2., 767.323, 767.80 (1) (intro.), 767.80 (1) (c), 767.80 (2), 767.855, 767.863 (1m), 767.87 (1m) (intro.), 767.87 (8), 767.87 (9), 767.883 (1), 769.316 (9), 769.401 (2) (a), 769.401 (2) (g), 815.20 (1), 822.40 (4), 851.30 (2) (a), 852.01 (1) (f) 1., 852.01 (1) (f) 2., 852.01 (1) (f) 3., 854.03 (3), 891.39 (title), 891.39 (1) (a), 891.39 (1) (b), 891.39 (3), 891.40 (2), 891.41 (title), 891.41 (1) (intro.), 891.41 (1) (a), 891.41 (2), 905.05 (title), 938.02 (13), 938.396 (2g) (g), 943.20 (2) (c), 943.201 (1) (b) 8. and 943.205 (2) (b); and to create 69.15 (3) (b) 3m., 765.02 (3), 891.40 (1) (b), 891.40 (3), 891.41 (3), 990.01 (22m), 990.01 (39) and 990.01 (40m) of the statutes; Relating to: marriage between persons of the same sex and extending parentage rights to married couples of the same sex. (FE)
Title
Marriage between persons of the same sex and extending parentage rights to married couples of the same sex. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Constitution and Ethics and take up (Y: 34 N: 59 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-22 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Constitution and Ethics and take up, Ayes 34, Noes 59 |
2017-08-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Constitution and Ethics |
2017-06-30 | House | Introduced |