WI AB417 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 453.06 (1) of the statutes; relating to: requirements for initial licensure as a veterinarian.
Title
Requirements for initial licensure as a veterinarian.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | Published 6-1-2010 | |
2010-05-19 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-18-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 396 | |
2010-05-13 | Presented to the Governor on 5-13-2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2010-04-15 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-15 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-15 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-15 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on calendar 4-15-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-04-09 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-09 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-08 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-16 | Public hearing held | |
2009-10-29 | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs | |
2009-10-28 | Received from Assembly | |
2009-10-27 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-10-27 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 0 | |
2009-10-27 | Rules suspended | |
2009-10-27 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-10-27 | Read a second time | |
2009-10-21 | Placed on calendar 10-27-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-10-21 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-10-21 | Report passage recommended by committee on Agriculture, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | |
2009-10-20 | Executive action taken | |
2009-09-24 | Public hearing held | |
2009-09-11 | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture | |
2009-09-11 | Introduced |