WI AB413 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 36.42, 38.21 and 38.28 (2) (dm) of the statutes; Relating to: anti-racism and anti-sexism student instruction and anti-racism and anti-sexism training for employees at the University of Wisconsin System and the Technical College System. (FE)
Title
Anti-racism and anti-sexism student instruction and anti-racism and anti-sexism training for employees at the University of Wisconsin System and the Technical College System. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Hong, Shankland, Anderson, Baldeh, Billings, Brostoff, Conley, Considine, Drake, Emerson, Goyke, Haywood, B. Meyers, Moore Omokunde, Neubauer, S. Rodriguez, Shelton, Sinicki, Snodgrass, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Subeck, Vining and Vruwink |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives L. Myers, Stubbs, Baldeh, Drake, Haywood, Moore Omokunde, Anderson, Billings, Brostoff, Conley, Considine, Emerson, Goyke, Hong, B. Meyers, Neubauer, S. Rodriguez, Shankland, Shelton, Sinicki, Snodgrass, Spreitzer, Subeck, Vining and Vruwink |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Stubbs, Haywood, Baldeh, Drake, Moore Omokunde, Anderson, Billings, Brostoff, Conley, Considine, Emerson, Goyke, Hong, B. Meyers, Neubauer, S. Rodriguez, Shankland, Shelton, Sinicki, Snodgrass, Spreitzer, Subeck, Vining and Vruwink |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 10, Noes 4 |
2022-02-01 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2021-12-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-11-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Gundrum |
2021-10-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-06-28 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2021-06-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2021-06-25 | House | Introduced |