WI AB412 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 104.01 (2) (b) 5. of the statutes; Relating to: exemption of outside salespersons from the minimum wage law.
Title
Exemption of outside salespersons from the minimum wage law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-12 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-12 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 285 |
2014-04-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-04-03 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-3-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 18, Noes 15 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-11-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-12 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 56, Noes 38 |
2013-11-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-12 | House | Read a second time |
2013-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-10-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-10-31 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2013-10-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-10-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-10-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor |
2013-10-04 | House | Introduced |