WI AB410 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 49.45 (9r) (a) 7. c., 146.81 (1) (es), 146.997 (1) (d) 4., 146.997 (1) (d) 5., 155.01 (7), 252.14 (1) (ar) 4p., 440.03 (9) (a) (intro.), 440.03 (9) (a) 2., 440.03 (13) (b) (intro.), 440.03 (13) (c), 440.15, 446.01 (1v) (h), 448.956 (1m), 448.96 (4) and (6), 448.961, 448.968 (2) (intro.), 450.10 (3) (a) 5. and 451.02 (1); and to create 14.89, 440.03 (11m) (c) 2r., 448.96 (1n) and (1o) and subchapter XI of chapter 448 [precedes 448.987] of the statutes; Relating to: ratification of the Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Ratification of the Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2021-10-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-09-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-24 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2021-08-04 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor |
2021-07-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-07-26 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2021-07-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-01 | House | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor |
2021-06-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2021-06-25 | House | Introduced |