WI AB41 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 165.775 (3) (b) and 165.775 (4) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: a time limitation for processing sexual assault kits. (FE)
Title
A time limitation for processing sexual assault kits. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R] | Rep. Elijah Behnke [R] | Rep. Ty Bodden [R] |
Rep. Bob Donovan [R] | Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-11-06 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-06-14 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-05-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-05-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Murphy |
2023-02-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduced |