WI AB41 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Executive action taken
Pending: House Substance Abuse and Prevention Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 20.505 (1) (bg) and subchapter III of chapter 153 [precedes 153.85] of the statutes; Relating to: opioid and methamphetamine data system and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opioid and methamphetamine data system and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25HouseExecutive action taken
2021-05-05HousePublic hearing held
2021-02-23HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-02-22HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-02-22HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-02-19HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-02-18HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-02-10HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Substance Abuse and Prevention
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback