WI AB41 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Representative Murphy withdrawn as a coauthor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 944.30 (1m) (intro.) and 944.30 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: prosecuting a person under the age of 18 with committing an act of prostitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prosecuting a person under the age of 18 with committing an act of prostitution.

Sponsors

Rep. Jill Billings [D]Rep. Jim Steineke [R]Rep. Jodi Emerson [D]Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R]
Rep. Joel Kitchens [R]Rep. Michael Rohrkaste [R]Rep. Gary Hebl [D]Rep. Debra Kolste [D]
Rep. Robert Kulp [R]Rep. Evan Goyke [D]Rep. Jocasta Zamarripa [D]Rep. Robyn Vining [D]
Rep. Katrina Shankland [D]Rep. Don Vruwink [D]Rep. Chris Taylor [D]Rep. Lisa Subeck [D]
Rep. Paul Tittl [R]Rep. Greta Neubauer [D]Rep. Steve Doyle [D]Rep. Melissa Sargent [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R]Rep. Jonathan Brostoff [D]Rep. Sondy Pope [D]Rep. Patrick Snyder [R]
Rep. John Spiros [R]Rep. David Crowley [D]Rep. Mary Felzkowski [R]Rep. Dave Considine [D]
Rep. Shelia Stubbs [D]Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R]Rep. Treig Pronschinske [R]Rep. Beth Meyers [D]
Rep. Mark Spreitzer [D]Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R]Rep. Christine Sinicki [D]Rep. Jesse James [R]
Rep. Rick Gundrum [R]Rep. Robert Wittke [R]Rep. LaKeshia Myers [D]Rep. Tony Kurtz [R]
Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D]Rep. Shae Sortwell [R]Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R]Rep. Jimmy Anderson [D]
Rep. Scott Krug [R]Rep. David Murphy [R]Rep. Jason Fields [D]Rep. Warren Petryk [R]
Rep. Jim Ott [R]Rep. Staush Gruszynski [D]Rep. Daniel Riemer [D]Rep. David Steffen [R]
Rep. Ron Tusler [R]Rep. Marisabel Cabrera [D]Sen. Alberta Darling [R]Sen. LaTonya Johnson [D]
Sen. Patty Schachtner [D]Sen. Dan Feyen [R]Sen. Lena Taylor [D]Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D]
Sen. Janet Bewley [D]Sen. Jennifer Shilling [D]Sen. Janis Ringhand [D]Sen. Robert Wirch [D]
Sen. Jeff Smith [D]Sen. Fred Risser [D]Sen. Robert Cowles [R]Sen. Andre Jacque [R]
Sen. Luther Olsen [R]Sen. David Hansen [D]Sen. Jon Erpenbach [D]Sen. Christopher Larson [D]
Sen. Mark Miller [D]Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseRepresentative Murphy withdrawn as a coauthor
2019-04-29HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-04-29HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2019-04-10HouseExecutive action taken
2019-04-01HouseRepresentative Dittrich added as a coauthor
2019-03-27HousePublic hearing held
2019-03-04HouseRepresentative Bowen added as a coauthor
2019-02-28HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback