WI AB41 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.395 (2) (ec) and 84.182 of the statutes; Relating to: creating a local freight bridge program, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating a local freight bridge program, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-25 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Rules and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 24 (3)(a) |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2014-02-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-01-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ripp |
2013-03-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-02-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-02-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab41 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB41.pdf |