WI AB406 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: unemployment insurance contribution rates. (FE)
Title
Unemployment insurance contribution rates. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-08 | House | Published 7-9-2021 |
2021-07-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 7-8-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 59 |
2021-07-02 | House | Presented to the Governor on 7-2-2021 by directive of the Speaker |
2021-07-01 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 7-1-2021 |
2021-07-01 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-30-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-06-29 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-29 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2021-06-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-29 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-29 | House | Read a second time |
2021-06-28 | House | Referred to calendar of 6-29-2021 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 |
2021-06-28 | House | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2021-06-23 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-06-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-06-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2021-06-23 | House | Introduced |