WI AB405 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 118.02 (7w) of the statutes; Relating to: special observance days in schools.
Title
Special observance days in schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2021-10-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-10-21 | House | Representative Penterman added as a coauthor |
2021-10-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-09-29 | House | Representative Ramthun added as a coauthor |
2021-09-27 | House | Representative Kurtz added as a coauthor |
2021-06-29 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2021-06-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2021-06-17 | House | Introduced |