WI AB403 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend chapter 40 (title); and to create 15.165 (5), 20.515 (1) (k), 20.515 (2), 25.17 (1) (yu), 25.52 and subchapter X of chapter 40 [precedes 40.99] of the statutes; Relating to: the creation of a private retirement security plan and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
The creation of a private retirement security plan and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on State Affairs and take up (Y: 34 N: 59 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-22 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on State Affairs and take up, Ayes 34, Noes 59 |
2017-07-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2017-06-21 | House | Introduced |