WI AB402 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 77.54 (9m); and to create 77.54 (9a) (j) of the statutes; Relating to: a sales and use tax exemption for sales to a state veterans organization. (FE)
Title
A sales and use tax exemption for sales to a state veterans organization. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Published 4-4-2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 190 |
2018-04-02 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018 |
2018-03-29 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-29-2018 |
2018-03-29 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 31, Noes 1 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | House | Representatives Barca and Shankland added as coauthors |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:07 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 11, Noes 4 |
2018-02-15 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-13 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Jacque |
2017-11-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-10-19 | House | Withdrawn from joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions and referred to committee on Ways and Means |
2017-07-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions |
2017-06-21 | House | Introduced |