WI AB40 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.016 (1) (b); and to create 118.016 (3) and 118.016 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: reading readiness assessments and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Reading readiness assessments and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-02-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-15 | House | Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor |
2023-02-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduced |