WI AB40 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 238.137 of the statutes; Relating to: entrepreneurial assistance grants and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Entrepreneurial assistance grants and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-03-13SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government
2018-02-23SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-02-22HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-22HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 90, Noes 1
2018-02-22HouseRules suspended
2018-02-22HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-22HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2018-02-22HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2018-02-22HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Barca and Neylon
2018-02-22HouseRead a second time
2018-02-21HouseMade a special order of business at 1:58 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
2018-02-01HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2018-02-01HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Jobs and the Economy, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2018-02-01HouseReport Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Jobs and the Economy, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2018-01-25HouseExecutive action taken
2018-01-23HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Neylon, Barca, E. Brooks and Ohnstad
2017-11-30HousePublic hearing held
2017-02-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-01-30HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Jobs and the Economy
2017-01-30HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback