WI AB4 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 76-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Report vetoed by the Governor on 2-20-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 71.05 (22) (dp) 1., 71.05 (22) (dp) 2. and 71.05 (22) (dt); and to create 71.05 (22) (dq) and 71.64 (9) (b) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: increasing the maximum deduction under the individual income tax sliding scale standard deduction. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the maximum deduction under the individual income tax sliding scale standard deduction. (FE)

Sponsors

Rep. Robin Vos [R]Rep. Jim Steineke [R]Rep. John Nygren [R]Rep. John Macco [R]
Rep. Terry Katsma [R]Rep. Scott Allen [R]Rep. Tyler August [R]Rep. Joan Ballweg [R]
Rep. Mark Born [R]Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R]Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R]Rep. Cindi Duchow [R]
Rep. James Edming [R]Rep. Mary Felzkowski [R]Rep. Rick Gundrum [R]Rep. Cody Horlacher [R]
Rep. Rob Hutton [R]Rep. John Jagler [R]Rep. Jesse James [R]Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R]
Rep. Dan Knodl [R]Rep. Scott Krug [R]Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R]Rep. Robert Kulp [R]
Rep. Tony Kurtz [R]Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R]Rep. Gae Magnafici [R]Rep. David Murphy [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R]Rep. Todd Novak [R]Rep. Loren Oldenburg [R]Rep. Jim Ott [R]
Rep. Kevin Petersen [R]Rep. Warren Petryk [R]Rep. Jon Plumer [R]Rep. Treig Pronschinske [R]
Rep. Romaine Quinn [R]Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R]Rep. Jessie Rodriguez [R]Rep. Michael Rohrkaste [R]
Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R]Rep. Michael Schraa [R]Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R]Rep. Patrick Snyder [R]
Rep. Shae Sortwell [R]Rep. John Spiros [R]Rep. Rob Stafsholt [R]Rep. David Steffen [R]
Rep. Rob Summerfield [R]Rep. Rob Swearingen [R]Rep. Gary Tauchen [R]Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R]
Rep. Paul Tittl [R]Rep. Travis Tranel [R]Rep. Ron Tusler [R]Rep. Nancy Vander Meer [R]
Rep. Tyler Vorpagel [R]Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R]Rep. Robert Wittke [R]Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R]
Rep. Ed Brooks [R]Sen. Scott Fitzgerald [R]Sen. Alberta Darling [R]Sen. Howard Marklein [R]
Sen. Duey Stroebel [R]Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R]Sen. Chris Kapenga [R]Sen. David Craig [R]
Sen. Dan Feyen [R]Sen. Andre Jacque [R]Sen. Devin LeMahieu [R]Sen. Patrick Testin [R]
Sen. Thomas Tiffany [R]Sen. Van Wanggaard [R]Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R]Sen. Roger Roth [R]

Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Assembly: Passed (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseReport vetoed by the Governor on 2-20-2019
2019-02-14HousePresented to the Governor on 2-14-2019 by directive of the Speaker
2019-02-14HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-14-2019
2019-02-14HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2019-02-13SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-02-13SenateRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 19, Noes 14
2019-02-13SenateRules suspended
2019-02-13SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-02-13SenateRead a second time
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on calendar 2-13-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-02-12SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2019-02-12SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-02-12SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2019-02-12SenateReceived from Assembly
2019-02-12HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-02-12HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 33, Paired 2
2019-02-12HouseRules suspended
2019-02-12HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-02-12HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2019-02-12HouseRead a second time
2019-02-07HousePlaced on calendar 2-12-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-02-07HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-02-07HouseReport passage as amended, with emergency statement attached, pursuant to s. 16.47 (2), Wisconsin Statutes, recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 10, Noes 3
2019-02-07HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 0
2019-02-07HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance
2019-02-07HouseExecutive action taken
2019-02-07HouseLRB correction
2019-02-06HouseReferred to joint committee on Finance
2019-02-06HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 4
2019-02-06HouseExecutive action taken
2019-02-06HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-02-05HousePublic hearing held
2019-02-05HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Riemer, Doyle, Goyke, Haywood, Ohnstad and C. Taylor
2019-02-01HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-01HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback