WI AB4 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 66.1105 (14); to amend 66.1105 (6) (e) 1. a., 66.1105 (6) (f) 1. a. and 66.1105 (14) (title); and to create 66.1105 (6) (h) and 66.1105 (14) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: modifying the requirements for sharing tax increments by tax incremental districts and limiting the participation of certain special purpose districts in tax incremental district financing. (FE)
Title
Modifying the requirements for sharing tax increments by tax incremental districts and limiting the participation of certain special purpose districts in tax incremental district financing. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-03-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-02-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State and Local Finance |
2013-02-01 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab4 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB4.pdf |