WI AB4 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 66-3-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Published 4-26-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 66-3-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Published 4-26-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 227.01 (13) (zz), 344.01 (2) (am), 344.11, 632.32 (4r), 632.32 (6) (f) and 632.355; to renumber and amend 344.33 (2), 632.32 (6) (d), 632.32 (6) (e) and 632.32 (6) (g); to consolidate, renumber and amend 344.15 (1) (intro.), (a) and (b); to amend 121.555 (2) (a), 344.01 (2) (d), 344.55 (1) (intro.), 631.43 (3), 632.32 (2) (e) 3., 632.32 (2) (g) (intro.), 632.32 (4) (a) 1., 632.32 (4) (a) 2m., 632.32 (4) (a) 3m. and 632.32 (4) (d); to repeal and recreate 632.32 (2) (g) 2.; and to create 344.33 (2) (a), 344.33 (2) (b), 344.33 (2) (c), 632.32 (2) (ac) and 632.32 (2) (bh) of the statutes; relating to: automobile insurance coverage limits, permissible policy provisions, and proof of financial responsibility.
Title
Automobile insurance coverage limits, permissible policy provisions, and proof of financial responsibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - House - Refused to suspend rules to order immediately messaged (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - Refused to suspend rules to order immediately messaged (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - Refused to suspend rules to read a third time (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - Assembly amendment 12 laid on table (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - Assembly amendment 11 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - Assembly amendment 10 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - Assembly amendment 9 laid on table (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - Assembly amendment 8 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - Refused to suspend rules to order immediately messaged (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - Refused to suspend rules to read a third time (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - Assembly amendment 12 laid on table (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - Assembly amendment 11 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - Assembly amendment 10 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - Assembly amendment 9 laid on table (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - Assembly amendment 8 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | House | Published 4-26-2011 |
2011-04-12 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-12-2011. 2011 Wisconsin Act 14 |
2011-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-11-2011 |
2011-04-06 | House | Report correctly enrolled |
2011-04-05 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2011-04-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-04-05 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2011-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-04-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-04-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-5-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2011-03-10 | House | Messaged pursuant to Assembly Rule 50 (1) |
2011-03-08 | House | Refused to suspend rules to order immediately messaged, Ayes 57, Noes 38 |
2011-03-08 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 34 |
2011-02-02 | House | Refused to suspend rules to read a third time, Ayes 60, Noes 32 |
2011-02-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-02-02 | House | Assembly amendment 12 laid on table, Ayes 57, Noes 35 |
2011-02-02 | House | Record and vote on tabling AA12 expunged |
2011-02-02 | House | Assembly amendment 12 offered by Representative D. Cullen |
2011-02-02 | House | Assembly amendment 11 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 32 |
2011-02-02 | House | Assembly amendment 11 offered by Representatives Young, Kessler, E. Coggs and Zamarripa |
2011-02-02 | House | Assembly amendment 10 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 34 |
2011-02-02 | House | Assembly amendment 10 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr and Clark |
2011-02-02 | House | Assembly amendment 9 laid on table, Ayes 57, Noes 35 |
2011-02-02 | House | Assembly amendment 9 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr and Richards |
2011-02-02 | House | Assembly amendment 8 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 34 |
2011-02-02 | House | Assembly amendment 8 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr and Richards |
2011-02-02 | House | Assembly amendment 7 adopted |
2011-02-02 | House | Assembly amendment 1 adopted |
2011-02-02 | House | Read a second time |
2011-01-31 | House | Placed on calendar 2-2-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-01-27 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-01-27 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Insurance, Ayes 10, Noes 3 |
2011-01-27 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 7 adoption recommended by committee on Insurance, Ayes 8, Noes 5 |
2011-01-27 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Insurance, Ayes 8, Noes 5 |
2011-01-27 | House | Assembly amendment 7 offered by committee on Insurance |
2011-01-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-01-26 | House | Assembly amendment 6 offered by Representative Molepske Jr |
2011-01-26 | House | Assembly amendment 5 offered by Representative Molepske Jr |
2011-01-26 | House | Assembly amendment 4 offered by Representative Molepske Jr |
2011-01-26 | House | Assembly amendment 3 offered by Representative Molepske Jr |
2011-01-26 | House | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representative Molepske Jr |
2011-01-25 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Kapenga |
2011-01-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-01-18 | House | Representative Danou added as a coauthor |
2011-01-14 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance |
2011-01-14 | House | Introduced |