WI AB399 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 30.27 (3); and to create 30.27 (2) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: zoning ordinances in the Lower St. Croix riverway. (FE)
Title
Zoning ordinances in the Lower St. Croix riverway. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 35 |
2017-11-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a second time |
2017-10-31 | House | Placed on calendar 11-2-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-08-28 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-08-28 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 8, Noes 3 |
2017-08-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-07-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-06-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2017-06-19 | House | Introduced |