WI AB397 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-14)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Published 4-23-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 948.23; to amend 940.11 (2), 940.11 (3), 948.23 (title), 973.015 (1) (c) 2., 979.01 (1g), 979.01 (2), 979.01 (3), 979.01 (3m) and 979.01 (4); and to create 948.23 (1) (intro.), 948.23 (1) (b), 948.23 (2) and 948.23 (3) of the statutes; relating to: failing to report the death of a child or to report a missing child, moving the corpse of a child, hiding a corpse to collect public benefits, and providing penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Failing to report the death of a child or to report a missing child, moving the corpse of a child, hiding a corpse to collect public benefits, and providing penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-21 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-12HousePublished 4-23-2012
2012-04-10HouseReport approved by the Governor on 4-9-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 268
2012-04-05HousePresented to the Governor on 4-5-2012
2012-03-27HouseReport correctly enrolled
2012-03-06HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2012-03-06SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2012-03-06SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2012-03-06SenateRules suspended
2012-03-06SenateOrdered to a third reading
2012-03-06SenateRead a second time
2012-03-06SenateSenator Hansen added as a cosponsor
2012-03-05SenatePlaced on calendar 3-6-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2012-03-05SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2012-02-28SenateAvailable for scheduling
2012-02-28SenateReport concurrence recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2012-02-28SenateExecutive action taken
2012-02-22SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations
2012-02-22SenateReceived from Assembly
2012-02-21HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2012-02-21HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 92, Noes 2
2012-02-21HouseRules suspended
2012-02-21HouseOrdered to a third reading
2012-02-21HouseAssembly amendment 1 adopted
2012-02-21HouseRead a second time
2012-02-16HousePlaced on calendar 2-21-2012 by committee on Rules
2012-02-16HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2012-02-16HouseReport passage as amended recommended by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2012-02-16HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2012-02-16HouseAssembly amendment 1 offered by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections
2012-02-16HouseExecutive action taken
2012-02-09HousePublic hearing held
2012-02-06HouseRepresentative Weininger added as a coauthor
2011-11-23HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections
2011-11-23HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback