WI AB397 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 145.01 (10) (d); to renumber and amend 145.01 (10) (intro.), 145.01 (10) (a), 145.01 (10) (b), 145.01 (10) (c) and 145.01 (10) (e); to amend 145.01 (3m), 145.14 (2) (a) and 145.14 (2) (b); and to create 145.01 (10) (br) of the statutes; relating to: the definition of plumbing and classifying plumbers to do certain work.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The definition of plumbing and classifying plumbers to do certain work.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-28 Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2010-04-14 LRB correction
2009-10-29 Read first time and referred to committee on Commerce, Utilities, Energy, and Rail
2009-10-28 Received from Assembly
2009-10-27 Ordered immediately messaged
2009-10-27 Read a third time and passed
2009-10-27 Rules suspended
2009-10-27 Ordered to a third reading
2009-10-27 Assembly amendment 1 adopted
2009-10-27 Read a second time
2009-10-21 Placed on calendar 10-27-2009 by committee on Rules
2009-10-21 Referred to committee on Rules
2009-10-21 Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Labor, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2009-10-21 Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Labor, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2009-10-20 Assembly amendment 1 offered by committee on Labor
2009-10-20 Executive action taken
2009-10-14 Public hearing held
2009-08-31 Fiscal estimate received
2009-08-26 Read first time and referred to committee on Labor
2009-08-26 Introduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback