WI AB395 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to consolidate, renumber and amend 947.06 (1) and (2); and to create 947.06 (1m) (intro.) and (a) and 947.06 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: participation in a riot and providing a criminal penalty.
Title
Participation in a riot and providing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R] | Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] | Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] |
Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Chris Kapenga [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-10-27 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros |
2017-10-27 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-27 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 2 |
2017-10-27 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2017-10-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-10-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros |
2017-09-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-06-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-06-19 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab395 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB395.pdf |