WI AB387 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 16.705 (1b) (d) and 16.71 (5r); and to create 71.05 (6) (a) 30., 71.05 (6) (b) 57. and 224.55 of the statutes; Relating to: creating a child care reimbursement account program, providing an income tax subtraction for certain contributions to a child care reimbursement account, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a child care reimbursement account program, providing an income tax subtraction for certain contributions to a child care reimbursement account, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2023-10-18SenatePublic hearing held
2023-09-20SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families
2023-09-15SenateReceived from Assembly
2023-09-14HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2023-09-14HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 35
2023-09-14HouseRules suspended
2023-09-14HouseOrdered to a third reading
2023-09-14HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2023-09-14HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 35
2023-09-14HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Billings, Goyke, Ratcliff, Myers, C. Anderson, Vining, Jacobson, Palmeri, Emerson, Riemer, Baldeh, Haywood, Hong, Stubbs, Madison, Sinicki, Joers, Ohnstad, Shelton, Bare, Snodgrass, Subeck, Andraca, Clancy, Neubauer, Ortiz-Velez, Moore Omokunde, Considine, Cabrera, Shankland and J. Anderson
2023-09-14HouseRead a second time
2023-09-12HousePlaced on calendar 9-14-2023 by Committee on Rules
2023-09-12HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2023-09-12HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 4
2023-09-12HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 2
2023-09-12HouseExecutive action taken
2023-09-11HouseReport of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received
2023-09-11HouseExecutive action taken by joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions
2023-09-11HouseFiscal estimate received
2023-09-08HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goeben
2023-09-06HouseRepresentative Wichgers added as a coauthor
2023-09-06HousePublic hearing held
2023-09-06HouseFiscal estimate received
2023-09-05HouseSenator Ballweg added as a cosponsor
2023-09-01HouseRead first time and referred to Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions
2023-09-01HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2023-09-01HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab387
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2023/REG/AB387.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2023/REG/AB387-AA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2023/REG/AB387-ASA1.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/related/fe/ab387/ab387_dfi.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/related/fe/ab387/ab387_dor.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/related/fe/ab387/ab387_jscte.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/related/records/assembly/ways_and_means/1744932.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcamendmentmemos/2023/REG/AB387.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/related/records/joint/tax_exemptions/1791161.pdf
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2023/av0080
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2023/av0081

Bill Comments

feedback