WI AB387 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 70.03 (1) and 70.32 (1); and to create 70.32 (1b) of the statutes; Relating to: property tax assessments regarding leased property. (FE)
Title
Property tax assessments regarding leased property. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-20 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2017-11-30 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative R. Brooks |
2017-11-17 | House | Representative Anderson added as a coauthor |
2017-10-13 | House | Representative Wachs added as a coauthor |
2017-09-26 | House | Senator Vinehout added as a cosponsor |
2017-08-28 | House | Representative Vruwink added as a coauthor |
2017-08-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative R. Brooks |
2017-07-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative R. Brooks |
2017-06-30 | House | Representative C. Taylor added as a coauthor |
2017-06-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-06-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-06-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab387 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB387.pdf |