WI AB385 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 45.01 (12) (k) of the statutes; Relating to: indication of Hmong veteran status on an operator's license or identification card. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indication of Hmong veteran status on an operator's license or identification card. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-25HousePublished 3-23-2024
2024-03-25HouseReport approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 205
2024-03-18HousePresented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
2024-03-15HouseReport correctly enrolled on 3-15-2024
2024-03-12HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2024-03-12SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2024-03-12SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2024-03-12SenateRules suspended to give bill its third reading
2024-03-12SenateOrdered to a third reading
2024-03-12SenateRead a second time
2024-03-11SenatePlaced on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2024-03-11SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2024-03-11SenateAvailable for scheduling
2024-03-11SenateReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2024-03-08SenateExecutive action taken
2024-03-07SenateSenator Cowles added as a cosponsor
2024-03-06SenateSenators Wanggaard and Carpenter added as cosponsors
2024-02-15SenateRepresentative Emerson added as a coauthor
2024-01-19SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs
2024-01-18SenateReceived from Assembly
2024-01-18HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2024-01-18HouseRead a third time and passed
2024-01-18HouseRules suspended
2024-01-18HouseOrdered to a third reading
2024-01-18HouseRead a second time
2024-01-16HousePlaced on calendar 1-18-2024 by Committee on Rules
2024-01-16HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2024-01-16HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2023-12-05HouseExecutive action taken
2023-11-29HouseRepresentative Tusler added as a coauthor
2023-10-24HouseRepresentative Drake added as a coauthor
2023-10-24HousePublic hearing held
2023-09-26HouseFiscal estimate received
2023-09-08HouseRepresentative Jacobson added as a coauthor
2023-08-23HouseRepresentative Palmeri added as a coauthor
2023-08-16HouseFiscal estimate received
2023-08-11HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
2023-08-11HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback