WI AB382 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-14)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-14)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 457.25 (1); to renumber and amend 440.03 (13) (c); to amend 15.405 (7c) (a) 1., 15.405 (7c) (a) 2., 15.405 (7c) (a) 3., 15.405 (7c) (a) 4., 15.405 (7c) (am) 1., 15.405 (7c) (am) 3., 15.405 (7c) (c), 46.90 (4) (ab) 4., 48.56 (2), 48.561 (2), 49.45 (30j) (a) 1., 51.03 (6) (a), 55.043 (1m) (a) 4., 146.81 (1) (hg), 146.89 (1) (r) 6., 146.89 (1) (r) 7., 146.997 (1) (d) 11., 180.1901 (1m) (f), 252.14 (1) (ar) 7., 252.15 (1) (er), 253.10 (2) (f), 256.215 (2) (b), 257.01 (1) (a), 257.01 (1) (b), 303.08 (1) (f), 440.03 (13) (b) (intro.), 440.03 (14) (am), 440.043 (1), 440.094 (1) (c) 14., 440.15, 446.01 (1v) (m), 448.08 (4), 448.67 (4), 450.10 (3) (a) 10., chapter 457 (title), 457.01 (intro.), 457.01 (1c), 457.01 (1g), 457.01 (1r), 457.01 (1w), 457.01 (2r), 457.01 (10), 457.02 (intro.), (1), (2), (3), (4), (5), (5m) and (6) (c), 457.03 (1), (1m) and (2), 457.033, 457.035 (1) and (2), 457.04 (1), (2), (3), (4), (5) (a) and (b), (6) and (7), 457.06 (intro.), 457.09 (2) (b) and (4) (b) 1. and 2., 457.20 (1) and (2), 457.24 (1), 457.26 (1) and (2) (intro.) and (h), 632.89 (1) (e) 4., 800.035 (2m), 905.04 (1) (bm) and (dm) and 905.04 (1) (g); to repeal and recreate 632.89 (1) (dm); and to create 14.897, 440.03 (11m) (c) 2u., 440.03 (13) (c) 1. id., subchapter I (title) of chapter 457 [precedes 457.01], 457.01 (5g), 457.01 (5r), 457.01 (12), 457.08 (4m), 457.25 (1g) and subchapter III of chapter 457 [precedes 457.70] of the statutes; Relating to: ratification of the Social Work Licensure Compact. (FE)
Title
Ratification of the Social Work Licensure Compact. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-14 | House | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2023-12-11 | House | Representative Billings added as a coauthor |
2023-11-14 | House | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor |
2023-10-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-09-12 | House | LRB correction |
2023-09-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-08-11 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2023-08-11 | House | Introduced |