WI AB382 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.11 (57) (c) and 36.27 (1) (a); and to create 36.27 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: University of Wisconsin System resident undergraduate tuition and fees. (FE)
Title
University of Wisconsin System resident undergraduate tuition and fees. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-09-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-09-15 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Murphy |
2021-07-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-24 | House | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor |
2021-06-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection |
2021-06-07 | House | Introduced |