WI AB382 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 15.193, 15.204, 20.435 (8) (b), 20.435 (8) (c), 20.435 (8) (kw), 20.435 (8) (o) and 20.435 (8) (p); to amend 13.90 (1) (intro.), 13.90 (1m) (a), 13.90 (1m) (b), 15.01 (6) and 20.765 (3) (g); and to create 13.94 (1d), 13.97, 20.765 (3) (cm), 20.765 (3) (kr), 20.923 (6) (fm) and 230.08 (2) (fr) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a legislative office of inspector general and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Creating a legislative office of inspector general and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. David Craig [R] | Rep. Adam Jarchow [R] | Sen. Rob Hutton [R] | Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] |
Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Rep. Michael Schraa [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-10-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2015-10-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab382 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB382.pdf |