WI AB381 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 36.11 (27), 39.28 (6), 39.30 (2) (intro.), (a) and (b), 39.30 (2) (f) and 39.30 (3m) and (4); to amend 20.285 (1) (e), 36.66 (1) (a), 36.66 (2), 36.66 (3) (a) and (c), 36.66 (4), 36.66 (5), 36.66 (6) (a) (intro.), 36.66 (6) (b), 38.42 (1) (a), 38.42 (3) (c), 38.42 (6) (b), 39.285 (title), 39.30 (2) (title), 39.30 (2) (d), 39.30 (2) (e), 39.39 (2) (b), 39.435 (1), 39.435 (2), 39.435 (3), 39.435 (4) (a) and 39.435 (8); to repeal and recreate 39.30 (3); and to create 36.66 (1) (c), 39.285 (4), 39.30 (1m), 39.30 (2) (g) and 39.435 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: Wisconsin grants and other financial aid for higher education. (FE)
Title
Wisconsin grants and other financial aid for higher education. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-11-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Murphy |
2023-09-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-08-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-08-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-08-11 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2023-08-11 | House | Introduced |