WI AB379 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 115.38, 115.385, 118.42 (2), 118.42 (3) (a) (intro.), 118.42 (3) (a) 1., 118.42 (3) (b) and (c) and 118.42 (4) and (5); to renumber 115.28 (12) (title), 118.40 (5), 118.42 (1) (a) to (d) and 118.42 (3) (a) 2. to 5.; to renumber and amend 115.28 (12) (a), 115.28 (12) (ag) (intro.), 115.28 (12) (ag) 1. and 2. and 115.28 (12) (b); to amend 20.255 (1) (e), 20.255 (1) (he), 115.001 (1), 118.125 (4), 118.40 (2r) (b) 1. (intro.), 118.40 (2r) (b) 2., 118.40 (2r) (b) 2m., 118.40 (2r) (b) 4., 118.40 (2r) (bm), 118.40 (2r) (cm), 118.40 (2r) (d) (intro.), 118.40 (3) (e), 118.40 (4) (c), 118.42 (1) (intro.), 118.60 (10) (c), 118.60 (10) (d), 119.04 (1), 119.23 (10) (c), 119.23 (10) (d), 121.006 (2) (d) and 121.02 (1) (o); and to create 115.383 (4), 115.383 (5), 115.39, 118.40 (2r) (d) 3., 118.40 (3) (f), 118.40 (5) (b), 118.42 (1) (am) (intro.) and 1., 118.42 (1) (bm) (intro.) and 1., 118.42 (1) (cm), 118.42 (2m), 118.60 (9m), 119.23 (9m) and 120.12 (26) of the statutes; Relating to: the student information system, a school and school district accountability system, low-performing schools and school districts, and charter school contracts. (FE)
Title
The student information system, a school and school district accountability system, low-performing schools and school districts, and charter school contracts. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kestell [R] | Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-18 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Pope, Clark, Wright and Hesselbein |
2014-02-19 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Steineke |
2014-02-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-10 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Kestell and Steineke |
2013-12-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-09-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2013-09-19 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab379 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB379.pdf |